LA HB250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 425.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires residential treatment facilities to provide access to medication-assisted treatment for patients with opioid use disorder (REF NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Requires residential treatment facilities to provide access to medication-assisted treatment for patients with opioid use disorder (REF NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 250 ADOPT (#1004) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 250 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1005) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 250 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#646) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#440) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#180) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 250 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1005) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 250 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#646) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#440) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#180) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 425. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/19. |
2019-06-04 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2019-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Boudreaux, and Luneau. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-05-31 | House | House conferees appointed: Davis, Hoffmann, and Dustin Miller. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |