LA HB26 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a sales tax holiday to provide relief for recovery as a result of Hurricane Laura and the COVID-19 pandemic (Item #26) (EN -$4,500,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a sales tax holiday to provide relief for recovery as a result of Hurricane Laura and the COVID-19 pandemic (Item #26) (EN -$4,500,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - House - House Vote on HB 26 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#192) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 26 FINAL PASSAGE (#136) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 26 FINAL PASSAGE (#38) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseEffective date: 10/28/2020.
2020-10-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 16.
2020-10-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-21HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-20HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-10-20HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-20HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-10-19SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-14SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-14SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-07SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-10-06HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20.
2020-10-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-05HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-05HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-09-28HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB26&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189151
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190861
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191195
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193625
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194932
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190450
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190759
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191135
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192578
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192443
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192713
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193336
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193607
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189152
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190590
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190917
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191054
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191214
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192126
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192593
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193768
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191191
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193241

Bill Comments

feedback