LA HB276 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 42. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Grants advanced practice registered nurses signature authority on matters within their scope of practice

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants advanced practice registered nurses signature authority on matters within their scope of practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 276 FINAL PASSAGE (#282) (Y: 40 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 42. Failed to pass.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably (11-2).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback