LA HB279 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 427.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the transfer of firearms of persons who are prohibited from possessing a firearm in domestic abuse cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the transfer of firearms of persons who are prohibited from possessing a firearm in domestic abuse cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 279 FINAL PASSAGE (#870) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 279 FINAL PASSAGE (#442) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 427.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (11-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB279&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120244
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130197
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136340
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142161
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144903
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129965
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130672
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133007
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120262
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130342
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136547
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136311
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141646

Bill Comments

feedback