LA HB3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Omnibus Bond Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Omnibus Bond Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 3 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1060) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 3 ADOPT (#1043) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 3 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1017) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#1007) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 3 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 57TH DAY (#1014) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 3 2/3 vote (#998) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#854) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-06HouseHouse conferees appointed: Abramson, Jimmy Harris, and Stefanski.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-06SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Alario, LaFleur, and Morrell.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-06HouseRules suspended.
2019-06-06HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-05SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
2019-06-05HouseBy a vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2019-06-05HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 57th legislative day.
2019-06-05SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-06-03SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-06-02HouseCalled from the calendar, Rules Suspended
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-13HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2019-04-17HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB3&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125014
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141492
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141756
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143627
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133267
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133538
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141557
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142284
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143386
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143384
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125016
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141506
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142017
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142471
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143613
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143707
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143182
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143220
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143266
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143615

Bill Comments

feedback