LA HB334 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 35-3)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a concealed handgun permit holder to carry a concealed handgun in a place of worship
Title
Authorizes a concealed handgun permit holder to carry a concealed handgun in a place of worship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 334 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#678) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 334 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 334 RETURN CAL - SUBJ TO CALL (#599) (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 334 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 334 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 334 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 334 RETURN CAL - SUBJ TO CALL (#599) (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 334 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 72 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 334 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 186. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 20, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-1). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |