LA HB35 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-7)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-7)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a limitation of liability for donating certain wild game
Title
Provides a limitation of liability for donating certain wild game
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 125. |
2020-06-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-01-31 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/31/2020. |
2020-01-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-01-29 | House | Prefiled. |