LA HB358 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-7-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to marijuana for therapeutic use

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to marijuana for therapeutic use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 358 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#997) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#912) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 AMENDMENT # 3274 BY CLAITOR HB 358 BY JAMES (#911) (Y: 10 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 AMENDMENT # 3274 BY CLAITOR QUORUM CALL (#910) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 AMENDMENT # 3222 BY MILLS HB 358 BY JAMES (#909) (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 358 AMENDMENT # 2783 BY CLAITOR HB 358 BY JAMES (#736) (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#289) (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#289) (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseEffective date: 08/01/19.
2019-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 284.
2019-06-06HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-05HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-04HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/05/19.
2019-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-03SenateReconsidered.
2019-06-01SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2019-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 18 nays.
2019-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB358&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121359
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129772
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143113
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144127
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139031
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138395
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140814
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141601
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141119
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140974
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142032
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142022
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142403
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143004
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130157
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145860
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134074
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134195
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142043

Bill Comments

feedback