LA HB36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain schools from being members of or participating in competitions sponsored by organizations that delay a student's eligibility to participate in sports under certain circumstances
Title
Prohibits certain schools from being members of or participating in competitions sponsored by organizations that delay a student's eligibility to participate in sports under certain circumstances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-01-31 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/31/2020. |
2020-01-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-01-29 | House | Prefiled. |