LA HB37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 23, nays 68. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides parole eligibility for offenders who serve as mentors in the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections' inmate rehabilitation and workforce development program (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides parole eligibility for offenders who serve as mentors in the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections' inmate rehabilitation and workforce development program (EG DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 37 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 23 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 23, nays 68. Failed to pass.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (7-6).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019.
2019-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback