LA HB377 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 46. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Allen Toussaint Legacy Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Allen Toussaint Legacy Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 377 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 45 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 46. Failed to pass.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-30HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback