LA HB38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 25, nays 56. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 25, nays 56. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the minimum age relative to the distribution, sale, purchase, or possession of tobacco products, alternative nicotine products, or vapor products (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Raises the minimum age relative to the distribution, sale, purchase, or possession of tobacco products, alternative nicotine products, or vapor products (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#557) (Y: 25 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#557) (Y: 24 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#557) (Y: 24 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 25, nays 56. Failed to pass. |
2019-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (10-2). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-04-08 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019. |
2019-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |