LA HB38 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-23 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to funding university, parish, and municipal police departments (Items #15 and 16) (REF SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to funding university, parish, and municipal police departments (Items #15 and 16) (REF SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 Move to Regular order (#233) (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-23 - House - House Vote on HB 38 MOTION TO ADOPT (#271) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - House - House Vote on HB 38 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#245) (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#209) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 891 BY BOUDREAUX HB 38 BY HARRIS (#208) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 851 BY PEACOCK HB 38 BY HARRIS (#194) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#60) (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 352 BY FREEMAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#57) (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-10-23 - House - House Vote on HB 38 MOTION TO ADOPT (#271) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - House - House Vote on HB 38 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#245) (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#209) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 891 BY BOUDREAUX HB 38 BY HARRIS (#208) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 851 BY PEACOCK HB 38 BY HARRIS (#194) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#60) (Y: 61 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - House - House Vote on HB 38 AMENDMENT # 352 BY FREEMAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#57) (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-10-23 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 68, nays 29. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-10-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2020-10-23 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Cloud, and Boudreaux. |
2020-10-23 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2020-10-22 | House | House conferees appointed: Harris, Zeringue, and Deshotel. |
2020-10-22 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 77, nays 15, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2020-10-22 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 14 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-10-12 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-10-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/12/20. |
2020-10-06 | House | Notice given. |
2020-10-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-10-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported with amendments (13-6). |
2020-09-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |