LA HB391 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for prefiling and notice deadlines for bills affecting public retirement systems
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for prefiling and notice deadlines for bills affecting public retirement systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 391, FINAL PASSAGE (#1036) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-27 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-26 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 26, 2010. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported without amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |