LA HB404 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to clerks of court
Title
Provides relative to clerks of court
Sponsors
Rep. Les Farnum [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 404 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#644) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 404 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 404 FINAL PASSAGE (#29) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 404 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 404 FINAL PASSAGE (#29) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 264. |
2020-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-03-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20. |
2020-03-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |