LA HB405 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 60. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 60. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the deregulation of professional wrestling (EG -$64,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the deregulation of professional wrestling (EG -$64,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 405 FINAL PASSAGE (#173) (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 60. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/19. |
2019-04-29 | House | Notice given. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (14-2). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |