LA HB413 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that it shall be unlawful discrimination for a financial institution to refuse to provide services to any party because of the party's lawful engagement in commerce of firearms and ammunition (RE SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Title
Provides that it shall be unlawful discrimination for a financial institution to refuse to provide services to any party because of the party's lawful engagement in commerce of firearms and ammunition (RE SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 413 FINAL PASSAGE (#79) (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |