LA HB422 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to apprenticeships
Title
Provides relative to apprenticeships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 422 HB 422 BY EMERSON (#219) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |