LA HB438 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 03/31/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the classified police service in the city of Baton Rouge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the classified police service in the city of Baton Rouge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 438 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#903) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 438 FINAL PASSAGE (#755) (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 438 AMENDMENT # 2754 BY WHITE HB 438 BY JAMES (#754) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 438 FINAL PASSAGE (#446) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 03/31/2020.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 230.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 12. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-08HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled. To be introduced at a later date.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB438&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121672
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132520
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142190
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144093
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129116
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132509
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138814
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140886
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141582
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141986
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121707
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132900
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1146717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136355
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140891

Bill Comments

feedback