LA HB508 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 436.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to delivery of alcoholic beverages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to delivery of alcoholic beverages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 508 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#844) (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 508 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 508 FINAL PASSAGE (#198) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-22HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 436.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-02HouseRules suspended.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
2019-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-16SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-08SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-07HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported with amendments (11-4).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB508&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122093
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127802
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132282
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141638
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144985
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126698
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127767
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128346
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129556
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134729
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135716
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137233
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141449
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122160
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127943
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132328
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145632
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136491

Bill Comments

feedback