LA HB517 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to fees charged to students in elementary and secondary schools

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to fees charged to students in elementary and secondary schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 517 FINAL PASSAGE (#763) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 517 FINAL PASSAGE (#314) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: See Act.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 240.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback