LA HB526 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of prior authorization requirements in Medicaid managed care organizations for certain prescription medications used in treating opioid use disorder (RE DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Prohibits the imposition of prior authorization requirements in Medicaid managed care organizations for certain prescription medications used in treating opioid use disorder (RE DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 526 FINAL PASSAGE (#315) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |