LA HB537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to applicable fees and costs incurred for the production of records
Title
Provides relative to applicable fees and costs incurred for the production of records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 537 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1179) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 537 HB 537 BY GAROFALO (#1049) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#377) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 537 HB 537 BY GAROFALO (#1049) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#377) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 627. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0-1). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |