LA HB537 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Sulphur Industrial Development District

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Sulphur Industrial Development District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#492) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 537 FINAL PASSAGE (#124) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-28SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-05-04HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-03-31HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback