LA HB54 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date: 12/22/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the acceptance of digital identification (Item #28)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the acceptance of digital identification (Item #28)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-22 - House - House Vote on HB 54 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#247) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Vote on HB 54 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#193) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#139) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseEffective date: 12/22/2020.
2020-10-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 21.
2020-10-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-10-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-22HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-22HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-10-22HouseNotice Senate discharged from the Conference Committee.
2020-10-22SenateSenate Conference Committee members discharged.
2020-10-22SenateNotice the House discharged the Conference Committee and concurred in the Senate amendments.
2020-10-22HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-22HouseReconsidered.
2020-10-22HouseDischarged from Conference Committee.
2020-10-22SenateConference committee report received.
2020-10-22HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-10-21HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-10-21SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Ward, and Peacock.
2020-10-21SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-10-21SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-10-21HouseHouse conferees appointed: James, Davis, and Stefanski.
2020-10-20HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-10-20HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-20HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-10-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-14SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-14SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-07SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-10-06HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20.
2020-10-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-05HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-05HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB54&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189752
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190845
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191257
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194324
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194937
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190644
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190643
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190785
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191072
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192454
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192483
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193251
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193195
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193559
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193612
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194307
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189753
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190901
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191285
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192549
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191212
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193258

Bill Comments

feedback