LA HB56 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes administration of medical marijuana to a student by a parent, guardian, or authorized school employee at a public school (Item #42)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes administration of medical marijuana to a student by a parent, guardian, or authorized school employee at a public school (Item #42)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-23 - House - House Vote on HB 56 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#266) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-10-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Vote on HB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-23SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-10-23HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-10-23HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-23HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-10-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-21SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-14SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-10-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-12HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/13/20.
2020-10-12HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-12HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-12HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB56&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189773
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191643
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191283
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191639
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193645
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193709
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194372
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194256
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193974
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194417
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189774
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191660
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193738
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192345
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194385

Bill Comments

feedback