LA HB560 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 06/23/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 06/23/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to legislative continuance
Title
Provides with respect to legislative continuance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 560 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#903) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 560 FINAL PASSAGE (#844) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 560 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 560 FINAL PASSAGE (#844) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 560 FINAL PASSAGE (#49) (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Effective date: 06/23/17. |
2017-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 363. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17. |
2017-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/17. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (7-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |