LA HB569 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a state and local sales and use tax exemption for certain antique motor vehicles and increases the fee for issuance of certain license plates for antique motor vehicles (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a state and local sales and use tax exemption for certain antique motor vehicles and increases the fee for issuance of certain license plates for antique motor vehicles (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#501) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#84) (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback