LA HB578 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 443.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Dedicates the economic proceeds from the Deepwater Horizon litigation to transportation projects and redirects funding to the Construction Subfund of the Transportation Trust Fund (EN -$24,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicates the economic proceeds from the Deepwater Horizon litigation to transportation projects and redirects funding to the Construction Subfund of the Transportation Trust Fund (EN -$24,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 578 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#952) (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 578 FINAL PASSAGE (#872) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 578 FINAL PASSAGE (#322) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 578 TRANSPORTATION (#321) (Y: 15 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 578 AMENDMENT # 2744 BY WHITE MOTION TO ADOPT (#320) (Y: 21 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 578 AMENDMENT # 2744 BY WHITE END CONSIDERATION OF AMENDMENTS (#319) (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 578 AMENDMENT # 2741 BY LEBAS MOTION TO ADOPT (#318) (Y: 22 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 443.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 10. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2019-06-04HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-28SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (21-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB578&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122371
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129486
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134677
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142957
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145397
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128788
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129177
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129944
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130890
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134434
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134608
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134596
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134595
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134640
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134635
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134621
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137624
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138018
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138239
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138612
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138911
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140904
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139442
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138233
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141554
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141540
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141001
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142181
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142625
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122374
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128123
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129709
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130987
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134815
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134952
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137584
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143480
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134649
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134658
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141669

Bill Comments

feedback