LA HB592 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the period in which new applications for tax benefits pursuant to the Atchafalaya Trace Heritage Area Development Zone may be approved (EN -$8,400 GF RV See Note)
Title
Extends the period in which new applications for tax benefits pursuant to the Atchafalaya Trace Heritage Area Development Zone may be approved (EN -$8,400 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#543) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 112. | |
2011-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-06 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2011. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title. |