LA HB592 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date: May 25, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date: May 25, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for special divisions or sections in district courts
Title
Provides for special divisions or sections in district courts
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 592, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#854) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#839) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#421) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#839) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 592, FINAL PASSAGE (#421) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Effective date: May 25, 2012. | |
2012-05-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 270. | |
2012-05-17 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-09 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-08 | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-03 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-04-17 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2012. | |
2012-04-09 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-05 | Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |