LA HB596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Effective date: 07/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defines a commercial farmer for purposes of certain sales and use tax exemptions (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Defines a commercial farmer for purposes of certain sales and use tax exemptions (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 596 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1035) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 596 ADOPT (#1022) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 596 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#965) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 596 FINAL PASSAGE (#881) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 596 FINAL PASSAGE (#407) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 596 ADOPT (#1022) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 596 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#965) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 596 FINAL PASSAGE (#881) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 596 FINAL PASSAGE (#407) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2019. |
2019-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 366. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 7 nays. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Allain, and Carter. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Abramson, and DeVillier. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage. |
2019-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2019-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |