LA HB65 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 26, nays 62. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 26, nays 62. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to qualifications of jurors
Title
Provides relative to qualifications of jurors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 65 FINAL PASSAGE (#261) (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 26, nays 62. Failed to pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (9-6). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019. |
2019-03-13 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-13 | House | Prefiled. |