LA HB697 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Shreveport Metropolitan Planning Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Shreveport Metropolitan Planning Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 697 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#722) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 697 FINAL PASSAGE (#501) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 697 HB 697 BY MCCORMICK (#167) (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12HouseEffective date: 01/01/2022.
2020-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 294.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-28SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-26SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-05-26SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2020-05-25SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2020-05-25SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (9-5-1).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB697&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164266
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170474
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173295
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178639
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182371
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172622
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176197
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178148
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178446
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164275
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170524
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173327
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176227
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176808
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186420
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173245
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177226

Bill Comments

feedback