LA HB78 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the remission of a contractor's license renewal fee for the benefit of public construction education programs (OR +$925,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the remission of a contractor's license renewal fee for the benefit of public construction education programs (OR +$925,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-18 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-18 | House | Prefiled. |