LA HB791 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Revenue to create and manage a technology solution to centralize sales and use tax registration, filing, and remittance (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the Department of Revenue to create and manage a technology solution to centralize sales and use tax registration, filing, and remittance (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 791 FINAL PASSAGE (#342) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |