LA HB8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the rehire of retired teachers in the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana as substitute classroom teachers (EN INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to the rehire of retired teachers in the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana as substitute classroom teachers (EN INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 8 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#665) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#395) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#162) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#395) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#162) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 337. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2020-05-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-01-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020. |
2020-01-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-01-22 | House | Prefiled. |