LA HB82 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the legislative auditor to access data from the Department of Revenue for the purpose of auditing programs
Title
Authorizes the legislative auditor to access data from the Department of Revenue for the purpose of auditing programs
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020. |
2020-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |