LA HB85 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to criteria for making awards to crime victims

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to criteria for making awards to crime victims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 85 ADOPT (#961) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 85 MOTION TO ADOPT (#967) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 85 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#643) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 85 FINAL PASSAGE (#429) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 85 FINAL PASSAGE (#102) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-04SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-04HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
2019-06-03SenateConference committee report received.
2019-06-03HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2019-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Boudreaux, and Carter.
2019-05-31SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Billiot, Mack, and Marino.
2019-05-29SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
2019-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2019-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (13-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
2019-03-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB85&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116146
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127200
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142760
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144891
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125823
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127085
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134219
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139096
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1116154
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127322
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141934
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145646
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129153
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142587
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142640

Bill Comments

feedback