LA HB870 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the members of the Louisiana International Deep Water Gulf Transfer Terminal board of commissioners
Title
Provides relative to the members of the Louisiana International Deep Water Gulf Transfer Terminal board of commissioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 870 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1362) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 870 FINAL PASSAGE (#1114) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 870 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 870 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 870 FINAL PASSAGE (#1114) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 870 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 870 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-30 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-15 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |