LA HCR10 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests governing authorities of public schools to continue operational pay for school bus operators during emergencies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests governing authorities of public schools to continue operational pay for school bus operators during emergencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 10 ADOPT (#146) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#53) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-06-28SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2020-06-26SenateReported favorably.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-06-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-17HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20.
2020-06-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-11HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2020-06-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-06-08HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback