LA HCR28 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for members of congress
Title
Calls for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for members of congress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 28 ADOPT (#670) (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 28 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#186) (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Vote on HCR 28 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#186) (Y: 73 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 16 yeas and 18 nays. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 73, nays 14. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (13-0-1). |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |