LA HR22 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Basile High School wrestling team on winning the school's second consecutive state title at the 2020 Division III State Wrestling Championship
Title
Commends the Basile High School wrestling team on winning the school's second consecutive state title at the 2020 Division III State Wrestling Championship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |
2020-03-31 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |