LA HR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Division of Administration, office of community development, to disburse federal funds for project applications in round one of the Watershed Projects Grant Program to aid economic recovery from COVID-19 pandemic
Title
Urges and requests the Division of Administration, office of community development, to disburse federal funds for project applications in round one of the Watershed Projects Grant Program to aid economic recovery from COVID-19 pandemic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HR 30 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#238) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (20-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |