LA HR39 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 25, 2019, as Junior League Day at the state capitol and commends the Junior League for its contributions to the state of Louisiana
Title
Recognizes April 25, 2019, as Junior League Day at the state capitol and commends the Junior League for its contributions to the state of Louisiana
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-04-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |