LA HR49 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 17, 2019, as Louisiana Primary Care Association Day at the state capitol and commends LPCA
Title
Designates April 17, 2019, as Louisiana Primary Care Association Day at the state capitol and commends LPCA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-04-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |