LA HR64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Families and Friends of Louisiana's Incarcerated Children (FFLIC) and recognizes Thursday, May 11, 2017, as FFLIC's Mother's Day at the state capitol
Title
Commends Families and Friends of Louisiana's Incarcerated Children (FFLIC) and recognizes Thursday, May 11, 2017, as FFLIC's Mother's Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-04-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |