LA HSR1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved on 5/18/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Approved on 5/18/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study of the various provisions of Louisiana law applicable to survivors of sexual assault and sexual assault cases
Title
Requests a study of the various provisions of Louisiana law applicable to survivors of sexual assault and sexual assault cases
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Moore [D] | Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R] | Rep. Tanner Magee [R] | Rep. Tammy Phelps [D] |
Rep. Paula Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Approved on 5/18/2020. |
2020-05-13 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 5/13/2020. |
2020-05-04 | House | Received on 5/04/2020. |