LA SB106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes liens against certain immovable property for monies expended from the Hazardous Waste Site Cleanup Fund. (8/1/19)
Title
Authorizes liens against certain immovable property for monies expended from the Hazardous Waste Site Cleanup Fund. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#545) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 106 FINAL PASSAGE (#87) (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2019. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 85. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-08 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-04-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 6 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |