LA SB146 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for institutions of higher education to first use capital outlay funding for deferred maintenance projects. (8/1/16) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for institutions of higher education to first use capital outlay funding for deferred maintenance projects. (8/1/16) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 AMENDMENT # 1868 BY RISER SB 146 BY GATTI (#351) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |